Case: AP-73,368
AP-73,368
04/07/1999
Appeal Case Type
NEVILLE, ROBERT JAMES, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/19/2006 | ARCHIVED | | |
02/08/2006 | EXECUTED | | |
12/07/2005 | EXECUTION DATE SET | | |
01/21/2000 | EXECUTION DATE SET | | |
01/18/2000 | EXECUTION DATE SET | | |
12/27/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process | | |
12/27/1999 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
12/01/1999 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
12/01/1999 | OPINION ISSD | Affirmed | |
09/27/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process | | |
09/27/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
09/27/1999 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |
09/27/1999 | SUBMITTED | | |
09/20/1999 | SUPP RR FILED | | |
08/27/1999 | EXT BRIEF DISP | Granted | |
08/27/1999 | EXT BRIEF FILED | | |
08/26/1999 | DISMISS MOTION TO | | |
08/26/1999 | ORDER FILED | | |
07/26/1999 | REPORTERS RECORD FILED | | |
06/07/1999 | EXT RR DISP | Granted | |
06/07/1999 | EXT RR FILED | Filed | |
04/19/1999 | TC NOTICE RECEIVED | | |
04/07/1999 | DP BEGIN | | |
04/07/1999 | CLERK'S RECORD FILED | | |
04/07/1999 | DP BEGIN | | |
04/07/1999 | EXT RR DISP | Granted | |
04/07/1999 | EXT RR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/19/2006 | STORED | ARCHIVED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Tim Curry |
NEVILLE, ROBERT JAMESJR. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Robert Ford |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
371st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable HARRY HOPKINS
0685474A