judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MASSENGALE, JACK 3M BUSINESS PRODUCTS SALES

Case Information: 84-CV-0342
Short Caption:MASSENGALE, JACK 3M BUSINESS PRODUCTS SALESClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2541-79Filed Date:03/21/1984

Opening Event Date:03/21/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/13/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/10/1985
Argued/Submitted:10/29/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJack Massengale NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard A. Bussey NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Philip L. O'Neill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MASSENGALE, JACK ET AL 3M BUSINESS PRODUCTS SALES DIVISION
01/01/1906 BUSSEYR for: PHILIP ROSENBLOOM O'NEILLP for: 3M BUSINESS PRODUCTS
03/21/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/13/1984FiledRecord Completed
06/10/1985FiledBriefing Completed
10/29/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/30/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition