Case: 04-02-00272-CR
04-02-00272-CR
04/16/2002
Appeal from an Order Denying Bail
Ex Parte Carlos Coy
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/29/2002 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
10/29/2002 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
10/25/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/21/2002 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
08/21/2002 | Submitted | | |
08/21/2002 | Submission | | |
07/29/2002 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
07/29/2002 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
07/22/2002 | Late Record Letter To Court Reporter | | |
07/22/2002 | Late Record Letter To Trial Court Clerks | | |
04/16/2002 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
04/16/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/10/2002 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/19/2002 | Appealable Order signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/25/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ronald L. Sutton |
Coy, Carlos | Criminal - Appellant | Michael W. Ramsey Chip B. Lewis |
Trial Court Information
198th Judicial District Court
Kerr
Honorable Emil Karl Prohl
B02-102