judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. v. RETHA GUNTER, a personal representative of the estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES

Case Heading (06-205)
Parent:06-205Case Docketed On:09/06/2006
Consolidated: S-07-0076
Status:Closed
Original Court:United States District Court for the District of WyomingCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - United States District Court, District of Wyoming
Short Title:HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. v. RETHA GUNTER, a personal representative of the estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES
Full Title:HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC., Appellant (Defendant), v. RETHA GUNTER, a personal representative of the estate of JAMES ALBERT BATES, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHalliburton Energy Services, Inc.James Corey Worthen
Roger E. Shumate
AppelleeRetha C. GunterKent W. Spence
Mary Kristeen Hand

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 151
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/06/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
09/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/22/2006Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
11/09/2006Brief - Appellant with record appendix; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
12/26/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/08/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/31/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/12/2007Order - Assignment of judge - recusing Justice Kite and assigning Jeffrey A. Donnell, District JudgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/28/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
03/01/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/26/2007Order - Assignment of judge - replacing Jeffrey A. Donnell's assignment and assigning Dan R. Price, II, District JudgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/24/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Burke and Price, DJ (James C. Worthen and Roger E. Shumate, argument by Mr. Shumate for appellants; Kent W. Spence for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/01/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - Chief Justice sent letter to Judge Downes informing him that the court has stayed determination of the certified question until the standing issue is briefed in S-07-0076CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
07/23/2007Order - Consolidating cases for purposes of opinion.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docket (S-07-0076 only, oral argument already held in 06-205)OrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/26/2007Order - Assignment of Judge Dan R. Price II to act in this matter and recusing Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
07/26/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Original Papers. Record for direct appealRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/20/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order declining to answer certified question and affirming district court judgment. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal