judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. WILLIE L. MINICK

Case Information: 81-CF-0055
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. WILLIE L. MINICKClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F922-80Filed Date:12/05/1980

Opening Event Date:12/05/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/12/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/27/1981
Argued/Submitted:07/02/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeWillie L. Minick N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES MINICK, WILLIE L.
12/05/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/12/1981FiledRecord Completed
05/27/1981FiledBriefing Completed
07/02/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/05/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition