judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THORN (ED) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36187
Short Caption:THORN (ED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990480Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-08843
06/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. It appears that appellant was represented by the Washoe County Public Defender during the lower court proceedings. The Washoe County Public Defender shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 00-10230
06/16/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on June 14, 2000 appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 00-10343
07/06/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-11524
07/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 15, 2000, this court ordered counsel for appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. On July 6, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a response to our order. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant,within 10 days from the date of this order, shall file a transcript request form or certificate that no transcript is required. Counsel for appellant shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. This appeal shall proceed with NRAP 3C. 00-12465
08/25/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14975
08/25/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-14976
08/31/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-15413
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17380
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17460
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2000. 00-17460