judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9853
A-9853
11/08/1963
Application for Writ of Error
MIDWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY
MALLIE WAGNER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/04/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/26/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
11/18/1963Letter brief Petitioner
11/08/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/13/1964Response to Motion filed
02/06/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/04/1963Reply to Response
11/26/1963Response to Petition
11/18/1963Letter brief
11/08/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/08/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Midwestern Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Mallie WagnerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information