judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9867
A-9867
11/26/1963
Application for Writ of Error
THOMAS W. PORTER
FRANK P. WILSON, SR., AND WIFE, IRIS KIRK WILSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/16/1964Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/30/1964Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/23/1964Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/16/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
11/26/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/21/1967Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
04/07/1965Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
04/07/1965Dissenting opinion issued.
12/28/1964Response to Motion filed
12/16/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/02/1964Opinion issued
03/30/1964Brief on the Merits
03/23/1964Brief on the Merits
03/11/1964Document received (See Remarks)
03/11/1964Document received (See Remarks)
03/11/1964Document received (See Remarks)
12/16/1963Response to Petition
12/06/1963Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
11/26/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank P. Wilson, Sr., and wife, Iris Kirk WilsonRespondent
Thomas W. PorterPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information