judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9855
A-9855
11/12/1963
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM B. WESSON
DOROTHY GILLESPIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/29/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/19/1964Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/16/1964Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/04/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
11/12/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/29/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/20/1964Response to Motion filed
10/19/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/07/1964Opinion issued
04/16/1964Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/15/1964Document received (See Remarks)
12/04/1963Response to Petition
11/12/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/12/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William B. WessonPetitioner
Dorothy GillespieRespondent
Charles J. Lieck, Sr.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information