Case Information: 35582 | |||
Short Caption: | LUNA (JUAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991961 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/01/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-01628 | |
02/04/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/14/99, 12/15/99. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. | 00-01830 | |
02/10/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 00-02145 | |
02/17/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-02530 | |
02/28/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-03095 | |
05/10/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-07769 | |
06/06/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-09553 | |
06/06/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/21/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 15, 2000. | 00-09553 |