Case: 08-99-00102-CV
08-99-00102-CV
04/08/1999
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Averitt, III, W. T., Gloria Hope Ward Youngblood, C. Dwayne Youngblood, Cowden C. Ward, Jr., Sherry Ward and Robert G. Steel, Trustee
Huntsman Polymers Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/02/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/24/2001 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/12/2001 | Received notice that Petition for Review was filed in Supreme Court. | | |
11/21/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
10/25/2000 | Fee paid | | |
10/16/2000 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
10/16/2000 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
09/28/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed/Reversed & Rendered | |
09/28/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed/Reversed & Rendered | |
01/04/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/04/2000 | Submission | | |
01/04/2000 | Submitted | | |
12/03/1999 | Submission | | |
09/20/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
09/20/1999 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |
08/27/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
08/27/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/27/1999 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |
08/27/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/14/1999 | Fee paid | | |
07/02/1999 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/02/1999 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/02/1999 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
06/14/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
05/26/1999 | Inquiry to Clerk/Reporter Regarding No Record | | |
05/14/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
05/14/1999 | Envelope Filed, showing postmark date | | |
04/27/1999 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
04/27/1999 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
04/26/1999 | Fee paid | | |
04/26/1999 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
04/16/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/16/1999 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
04/15/1999 | Fee paid | | |
04/14/1999 | Docketing Statement Received | | |
04/08/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/08/1999 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
04/08/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/02/2001 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
AVERITT, III, W. T., ET AL. | Appellant | Hon. W. Clayton Gaston |
HUNTSMAN POLYMERS CORPORATION | Appellee | Hon. William L. Banowsky Hon. Joel B. Locke |
HUNTSMAN POLYMERS CORPORATION/ | Appellee | Hon. Scott D. Deatherage Hon. Scott P. Stolley |
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
Honorable Tryon D. Lewis
B-101,311