Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mayor & Horner--check no. 4326. | | |
02/01/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 00-01626 |
02/01/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | | |
02/07/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: January 27, 1999. | | 00-01923 |
02/11/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Neil Galatz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | | |
04/24/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 00-06553 |
04/24/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | | |
05/03/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 00-07227 |
05/05/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 00-07392 |
05/05/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: December 14, 1999 through December 17, 1999. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen. | | 00-07394 |
05/15/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-08048 |
05/17/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The motion filed by court recorder Carrie A. Hansen is granted. Court recorder hansen shall have to and including June 9, 2000, to file and serve the transcripts requested in this matter. | | 00-08212 |
06/12/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/14/99; 12/15/99; 12/16/99; 12/17/99; and Court Reporters: Debra Winn, J. Liston, and Carrie Hansen. | | 00-09852 |
07/13/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel. | | 00-12108 |
08/04/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On July 13, 2000, appellant filed a motion to associate California attorneys William H. Ginsburg and Terry L. Kesinger, both of the law firm of Cotkin, Collins & Ginsburg. We grant the unopposed motion. Attorneys Ginsburg and Kesinger shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellant in Docket Number 35581. Nevada attorney Sherman B. Mayor, of the law firm of Mayor, Horner, Kling & Stryker, Ltd., shall be responsible for all matters presented by appellant in this appeal. | | 00-13564 |
08/09/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 2, 2000. | | 00-13819 |
08/11/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice re: August 4, 2000 Order Granting SCR 42 Motion. (No action required:ah). | | 00-14032 |
09/29/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 9/28/00. | | 00-17237 |
09/29/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. | | 00-17238 |
09/29/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Request to take Judicial Notice. | | 00-17267 |
11/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 1, 2000. | | 00-19336 |
11/30/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-20899 |
12/04/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed November 30, 2000, is granted. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before January 2, 2001. | | 00-21070 |
01/03/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 01-00136 |
01/08/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have to and including February 1, 2001, to file and serve the answering brief. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | | 01-00385 |
01/10/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 01-00525 |
02/05/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Amended Motion for Extension of Time in Light of Appellant's Request to Consolidate. | | 01-02278 |
02/05/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Light of Appellant's Request to Consolidate. | | 01-02325 |
02/09/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time. | | 01-02714 |
02/12/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Firm Name Change. Mayor, Horner, Kling, Stryker & Burk, Ltd. | | 01-02799 |
02/26/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 01-03583 |
04/18/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On September 29, 2000, appellant filed a motion requesting this court to take judicial notice of a letter dated November 12, 1997, from the Honorable Mark Gibbons, District Judge, addressed to all counsel in the case below. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. The clerk of this court shall file as a separate document in the record of this case, the November 12, 1997, letter attached to appellant's September 29, 2000,motion as 'exhibit 1.' On January 10, 2001, appellant filed an opposition to respondent's January 3, 2001, motion. We elect to treat appellant's opposition as a motion for reconsideration of our January 8, 2001, order, and deny that motion. On February 5, 2001, respondent filed a 'Motion for Extension of Time in Light of Appellant's Request to Consolidate.' Respondent also filed an amended version of that motion on the same date. On February 9, 2001, appellant filed an opposition to respondent's motion for a fourth extension of time to file the answering brief. We remind the parties that this court must either grant a motion to consolidate or consolidate appeals sua sponte; and that until such time, all deadlines and briefing schedules remain in effect.fn1[In respondent's February 5, 2001, motion entitled 'Motion for Extension of Time In Light of Appellant's Request to Consolidate,' respondent 'requests the above extension and consolidation.' In light of the fact that appellant has not requested any consolidation with this court, and that respondent does not provide good cause for consolidation in the motion, we deny the request for consolidation.] Accordingly, no good cause appearing, we deny respondent's February 5, 2001, motion and amended motion. On February 26, 2001, respondent submitted the answering brief along with a motion for a fifth extension of time to file the untimely answering brief. In the interest of judicial economy, we grant that motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received on February 26, 2001. We admonish counsel for respondent that any such dereliction in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief. | | 01-06652 |
04/18/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Letter dated November 12, 1997, from the Honorable Mark D. Gibbons, District Judge, addressed to all counsel in the case below. 'MISSING." | | 01-06657 |
04/18/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/23/01. | | 01-03585 |
05/14/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/11/01. | | 01-07962 |
05/14/2001 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | | |
08/29/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 35581/36623. | | 01-14640 |
09/19/2001 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Consolidation. | | 01-15823 |
09/19/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Expedite the Appeal. | | 01-15824 |
09/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. (Filed via fax.) | | 01-15986 |
09/24/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. (Original--filed via fax on 9/21/01.) | | 01-16101 |
09/25/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. filed September 21, 2001. The clerk shall file the opposition to motion to consolidate received on September 19, 2001. | | 01-16140 |
09/25/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Consolidation. | | 01-15823 |
10/17/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. | | 01-17516 |
11/07/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | | 01-18610 |
11/07/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML | | |
01/02/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. We elect to consolidate these appeals for all further proceedings. In light of this order, we deny as moot appellant's motions to consolidate and for leave to file a reply to the opposition to the motion to consolidate. We deny respondent's motion to expedite this appeal. nonetheless, we will decide these appeals as expeditiously as this court's caseload permits. Oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 35581/36623. (02-00110) | | 02-00110 |
01/02/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. Consolidated appeals Docket No. 35581 and Docket No. 36623. | | |
01/02/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to the Mayor firm. Returned unfiled, the Original Response to Expedite the Appeal, received October 11, 2001 and the Original Reply to Opposition to Motion to Consolidate, received October 11, 2001. | | |
02/11/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. fn1[On January 2, 2002, the court ordered the consolidation of Valley Hospital's two appeals, No. 35581 and 36623.] 'We AFFIRM the judgment for negligent infliction of emotional distress and for wrongful death. We REVERSE the district court's order awarding attorney fees and REMAND the matter of attorney fees to the district court to determine an appropriate hourly rate based on the fee customarily charged in the locality for similar legal services.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 35581/36623. | | 02-02643 |
03/08/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 02-02765 |
03/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/25/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Petition to Publish Decision. Nos. 35581/36623. | | 02-05212 |
04/01/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 20, 2002. | | 02-02765 |
04/24/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Denying Petition to Publish Decision. On February 11, 2002, this court entered an Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in part and Remanding in these consolidated appeals. On March 25, 2002, respondent Rosie Puckett filed a petition to publish that order as an opinion. We conclude that publication is not warranted. We deny the petition. Nos. 35581/36623. (02-07216) | | 02-07216 |