judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9842
A-9842
10/24/1963
MISC PETITION
CONSOLIDATED CREDIT CORPORATION OF ARLINGTON, ET AL.
HON. FRANCIS A. MISKELL, REGULATORY LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/28/1963Supplemental Brief filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/1963Opinion issued
11/06/1963Order from Lower Court filed
11/01/1963Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
10/28/1963Response to Motion filed
10/28/1963Supplemental Brief filed
10/25/1963Miscellaneous Motion
10/24/1963Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Consolidated Credit Corporation of Arlington, et al.Relator
Hon. Francis A. Miskell, Regulatory Loan Commissioner of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information