Case: A-9878
A-9878
12/05/1963
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF FORT WORTH, ET AL.
E. G. AYCOCK, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/21/1964 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
01/04/1964 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/21/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/05/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/17/1964 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/11/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/21/1964 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
01/04/1964 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/04/1964 | Motion to Amend Filed | | ||
12/21/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/05/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/05/1963 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
E. G. Aycock, et ux. | Respondent | |
City of Fort Worth, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information