Case Information: 35584 | |||
Short Caption: | HUNSUCKER (WESLEY C.) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35283 , 36204 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 1758 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/02/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/02/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01698 | |
02/03/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 21, 1999. Court Reporter: Marcelene Varney. | 00-01729 | |
02/22/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 03/24/00; 04/14/99; 05/26/99; 06/16/99; 06/30/99 and 08/11/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. | 00-02724 | |
03/08/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. On February 15, 2000, this court received proper person documents from appellant. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person and requests that he be appointed an attorney for this appeal. We have considered appellant's proper person documents and determined they do not warrant the relief requested. .This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Lewis S. Taitel shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 00-03647 | |
03/28/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 2, 3, 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Christy Y. Hamrey. | 00-04926 | |
04/18/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-06153 | |
04/19/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix no later than May 31, 2000. | 00-06287 | |
06/01/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-09291 | |
06/01/2000 | Other | Other. Returned, unfiled Joint Appendix w/letter. | ||
06/05/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Verification (re: Fast Track Statement). | 00-09445 | |
06/12/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-09886 | |
06/12/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Joint Appendix, Vols. 1 through 3. | 00-09887 | |
06/12/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. | 00-09889 | |
07/06/2000 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (late and appendix attached). | ||
07/19/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-12490 | |
08/01/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on July 19, 2000. | 00-13316 | |
08/01/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-12491 | |
08/01/2000 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (Supplemental). | 00-12492 | |
10/03/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." fn4[Counsel's fast track statement is inadequate in its citation to relevant legal authority. Counsel is cautioned that, in the future, such dereliction of his duty pursuant to the provisions of NRAP 3C may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions.] fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we concluede that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 00-17428 | |
10/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. 11/08/00 order: no action will be taken with regard to attorney Taitel's withdrawal of attorney. | 00-17970 | |
10/16/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. | 00-18345 | |
10/31/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-17523 | |
10/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/08/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On October 11, 2000, appellant's counsel filed a document entitled "Withdrawal of Attorney". This court having entered an order of affirmance on October 3, 2000, and having issued the remittitur on October 31, 2000, no action will be taken with regard to attorney Taitel's withdrawal of attorney. | 00-19626 | |
11/29/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2000. | 00-17523 |