Case Information: 35562 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON VS. COMMISSION ON ETHICS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - NONE | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01470 | |
03/15/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-04137 | |
04/11/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-05760 | |
04/11/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2000. | 00-05760 |