Case Heading (S-18-0248) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0248 | Case Docketed On: | 10/22/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Second Judicial District Albany County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | GARRETT A. WRIGHT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | GARRETT A. WRIGHT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Garrett A. Wright | R. Michael Vang Timothy K. Newcomb |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Darrell Duane Jackson Catherine M. Mercer |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 49 |
Citation: | 440 P.3d 1092 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
10/22/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
10/22/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
10/22/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
10/22/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/23/2018 | Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Record | Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Final | |
12/03/2018 | Event - Rejected Filing of Brief of Appellant and Motion for Fees & Costs. Brief was uploaded twice to same efile; Statement of Costs should not be efiled as Motion for Fees & Costs. | Event | Rejected Filing | Final | |
12/03/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
12/05/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
01/17/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval | Notice-Incoming | Consent and Approval | Final | |
01/17/2019 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
01/18/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and Approval; Brief of Appellee; and received Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/04/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/08/2019 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
02/12/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
02/12/2019 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes (Volumes 1 and 2 - Original Papers; Volume 3 - Confidential file; Volume 4 - four transcripts) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
02/12/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
02/15/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Catherine M. Mercer obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
02/25/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from R. Michael Vang obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
03/12/2019 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice - argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (R. Michael Vang o/b/o Appellant; Katherine A. Adams and Catherine M. Mercer, Student Director, PAP, argument by Ms. Mercer, o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
05/14/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Justice Boomgaarden writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/30/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/30/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/30/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/30/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
06/04/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/31/2019 by Dara M. Boyd | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |