judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. H. KOKERNOT, ET AL. v. HOMER ORIN GILSTRAP, ET UX.

Case: A-186
A-186
05/20/1944
Application for Writ of Error
W. H. KOKERNOT, ET AL.
HOMER ORIN GILSTRAP, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/30/1945Amended motion for rehearingRespondent
11/22/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/17/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/12/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/26/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/05/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/30/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/30/1945Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
11/22/1944Response to Brief filed
11/17/1944Brief on the Merits
10/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/12/1944Motion for RehearingFiling granted
06/26/1944Response to Brief filed
06/05/1944Brief in Support of Petition
05/30/1944Response to Petition
05/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Homer Orin Gilstrap, et ux.Respondent
W. H. Kokernot, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information