judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

UNLIMITED HOLDINGS, INC. VS. COSTELLO

Case Information: 36191
Short Caption:UNLIMITED HOLDINGS, INC. VS. COSTELLOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A400222Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/01/2000 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/26/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hardy & Hardy-check no. 6746.
05/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-08980
06/01/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/05/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Negotiations are continuing. Settlement Judge has been advised of a partial settlement. (Nos. 35556 and 36191).
10/05/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-17656
10/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-18270
11/16/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-20152
11/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-20279
11/20/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.