judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HART, JOHN F. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0374
Short Caption:HART, JOHN F. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:81-CF-0374Consolidated: 83-CF-1049
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:02/20/1981

Opening Event Date:02/20/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/21/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/21/1984
Argued/Submitted:05/23/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Eric A. Seitz NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert H. Klonoff YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John A. Terry NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HART, JOHN F. UNITED STATES
02/20/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/21/1982FiledRecord Completed
02/21/1984FiledBriefing Completed
05/23/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition