judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL EARL SHUMAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-33)
Case Number:06-33Case Docketed On:02/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DANIEL EARL SHUMAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL EARL SHUMAKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel Earl ShumakerD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 143
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/06/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
07/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief (Chief Justice Voigt was made aware it was 4th request)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/31/2006Order - Grant - fourth extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/06/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
10/20/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/23/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/04/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/19/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/23/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/05/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/07/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/28/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seven volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; volumes III-V, transcripts; volume VI, confidential information; volume VII, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/07/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/25/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/25/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/27/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/26/07 by Michelle Crotteau.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal