Case: A-9882
A-9882
12/06/1963
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT RUNYON, ET UX.
CITY OF BROWNSVILLE, BROWNSVILLE CONSOLIDATED, I.S.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/30/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
12/26/1963 | Supplement to Response | Petitioner | | |
12/12/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/12/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/06/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/03/1964 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
02/03/1964 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/30/1964 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
12/26/1963 | Supplement to Response | | ||
12/12/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/12/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/06/1963 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/06/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Robert Runyon, et ux. | Petitioner | |
Brownsville Consolidated, I.S.D. | Respondent | |
CITY OF BROWNSVILLE | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information