Case Information: 35558 | |||
Short Caption: | SANABRIA-AGUILAR (TITO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991666 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-01451 | |
02/25/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Theodore David Gamboa shall file the transcript request form or certificate stating that no transcript is required within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 00-03015 | |
03/13/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Clarification. | 00-03916 | |
03/30/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 13, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for clarification. Counsel for appellant shall file the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order, or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. fn1[If, after consultation with counsel, appellant wishes to withdraw this appeal voluntarily, counsel for appellant shall file a notice of withdrawal of appeal.] | 00-05117 | |
05/01/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-07052 | |
05/09/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The motion for an extension of forty-five days to file the fast track statement and appendix is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 20 days or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. | 00-07640 | |
06/01/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-09279 | |
06/08/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-09670 | |
06/08/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 00-09671 | |
07/10/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-11696 | |
08/07/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13579 | |
08/07/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/14/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2000. | 00-13579 |