Case Information: 81-CF-0397 | |||
Short Caption: | GARRIS, DAVID I. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide |
Lead: | 81-CF-0397 | Consolidated: | 82-CF-0794 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F5255-80 | Filed Date: | 02/13/1981 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/13/1981 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/30/1981 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/27/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/30/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | David I. Garris | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GARRIS, DAVID I. A/K/A RONNIE GARRIS UNITED STATES | |||
02/13/1981 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/30/1981 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/27/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/30/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
08/04/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |