judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIKE SCHMID v. PAT SCHMID

Case Heading (06-268)
Parent:06-268Case Docketed On:11/30/2006
Consolidated: 06-270
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:MIKE SCHMID v. PAT SCHMID
Full Title:MIKE SCHMID, Appellant (Defendant), v. PAT SCHMID, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMike SchmidClark D. Stith
AppelleePat SchmidP. Richard Meyer
Robert N. Williams

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 148
Citation:166 P.3d 1285

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/12/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
01/16/2007Event - Phone Call - called counsel re receipt of brief in companion appeal Advised need to file motion to consolidate appeals if only filing one brief.EventPhone CallFinal
01/17/2007Motion - Consolidate - Cae Nos. 06-270 and 06-268. Received replacement page for brief.MotionConsolidateFinal
01/18/2007Order - Consolidating cases - 06-270 and 06-268. Backdated replacement cover pages and replaced on all briefs.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
02/22/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/06/2007Brief - Appellant reply; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seven volumes: Volumes I through IV, original papers; Volume V, transcripts; Volumes VI through VII, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argumentOrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Clark D. Stith for appellant; P. Richard Meyer for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/18/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/08/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal