judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1607
B-1607
06/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
DAVID FOSTER, ET AL.
WILLIAM H. SPICE, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/12/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/17/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/15/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
06/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/12/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/17/1969Reply to Response
07/15/1969Response to Petition
07/02/1969Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
06/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
David Foster, et al.Petitioner
William H. Spice, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information