Case Information: 33264 | |||
Short Caption: | CRAINE (LEONARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33481 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C93664 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/05/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/04/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-00695 | |
11/04/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/10/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial record in each of the above identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. (nos. 33070, 33103, 33117, 33120, 33153, 33158, 33199, 33200, 33264, 33265. | ||
03/05/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | ||
03/05/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/21/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Remand for Hearing on Actual Innocence. | ||
02/18/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time within which to File Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Remand for Hearing on Actual Innocence. | 00-02588 | |
10/11/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. Order Administratively Closing Docket No. 33481 and Remanding Docket No. 33264. fn1[The appeals were inadvertently docketed in this court as separate proceedings in Docket Nos. 33264 and 33481. Because the appeals both challenge the same district court order, we direct the clerk of this court to close the appeal in Docket No. 33481 administratively.] The office of the Federal Public Defender has now filed a motion requesting this court to remand this appeal to the district court for an evidentiary heearing to establish appellant's actual innocence. We have carefully reviewed the record, the pending motion, the documentation attached thereto, and the State's response. fn3[We grant the State's motion to file an untimely response to the motion for a remand. The clerk of this court shall file the response provisionally submitted by the State.] We grant the motion, and " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings on appellant's claim." This order constitutes our final resolution of this appeal; any further appellate proceedings in this matter shall be docketed in this court as new and separate matters. SNP00A-WM/ML/NB. Nos. 33264, 33481. | 00-18014 | |
10/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Remand for Hearing on Actual Innocence. | 00-02412 | |
11/07/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-18193 | |
11/07/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. | 00-18193 |