Case Information: 86-BG-1006 | |||
Short Caption: | TYLER, CARROLL | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 07/08/1986 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/08/1986 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | Carroll Tyler | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TYLER, CARROLL IN THE MATTER OF | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 013087 ORD: GRANT MO TO APPT NOTE - 01 COUNSEL & APPT. CLARK U. NOTE - 02 FLECKINGER TO REPRESENT NOTE - 02 RESPONDENT W/RESPECT TO THE NOTE - 03 INTERESTS OF RESPONDENT'S NOTE - 03 CLIENTS. NOTE - 04 103087 ORDER: GRANT MO OF CT NOTE - 04 APPOINTED COUNSEL & RESPONDENT NOTE - 05 IS DIRECTED PURSUANT TO RULE NOTE - 05 XI, SECS. 19(2) & 20(1), TO NOTE - 06 PROVIDE SUCH COOPERATION TO NOTE - 06 CT-APPOINTED COUNSEL IN HIS NOTE - 07 GATHERING OF INFORMATION NEC NOTE - 07 TO PROTECT THE INTERESTS OF NOTE - 08 RESPONDENT'S CLIENTS AS CT-AP NOTE - 08 COUNSEL DEEMS NEC TO HIS PER- NOTE - 09 FORMING HIS DUTIES. NOTE - 09 | |||
06/27/1986 | PETITION FOR DISABILITY SUSPENSION TRANSMITTED BY BAR COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/08/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
07/08/1986 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
07/08/1986 | ORDER SUSPENDING RESPONDENT UNTIL DETERMINATION IS MADE W/RESPCT TO RESPONDENT'S CAPABILITY. PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/08/1986 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - S METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE | |||
01/30/1987 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03 ACG PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/25/1987 | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPOINTED COUNSEL TO COMPEL RESPONDENT TO COOPERATE, ETC. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/02/1987 | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF BAR COUNSEL JOINING IN CT APPOINTED COUNSEL'S MO TO COM- PEL. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/30/1987 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 09. EBP PANELFEST SCDATE 100787 SCHPRD VS |