judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PECKHAM (GARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 31670
Short Caption:PECKHAM (GARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C141044Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/07/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.)
03/06/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order, or show cause why he should not be sanctioned.
03/19/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of transcript of proceedings. Jury trial--11/17/97; 11/18/97; Sentencing--1/6/98.
03/23/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To complete the fast track statement.
03/30/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix no later than April 22, 1998, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned. Fn1[On March 6, 1998, this court ordered counsel for appellant to file the fast track statement within 10 days or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned. Based on the response filed by counsel, we conclude that sanctions are not warranted at this time.]
04/24/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
04/24/1998Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement.
05/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On April 24, 1998, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is granted. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement submitted on April 24, 1998.
05/08/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (STRICKEN per order 5/19/98.)
05/12/1998MotionFiled Motion. To strike fast track statement.
05/19/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondent's motion to strike the fast track statement is granted. The clerk of this court shall forthwith strike appellant's fast track statement. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file a new fast track statement with adequate references to the record and adequate application of the law to the facts. The fast track response shall be due no later than 10 days from the date of the filing of the fast track statement, and shall also comply with the above guidelines. Failure to comply with the provisions of NRAP 28(e) and 3C may subject counsel to sanctions.
05/19/1998Other Other. Fast track statement stricken.
06/23/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. To date, the fast track statement has not been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days or show cause why he should not be sanctioned.
07/09/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From attorney Alan R. Harter regarding representing appellant.
07/15/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Due to an error in this court's records, attorney Alan R. Harter is listed as counsel for appellant. In fact, appellant is being represented by Steven Hill for purposes of this appeal. The clerk shall correct the designation of counsel to reflect that appellant is represented by Steven Hill. Steven Hill shall file a new fast track statement on behalf of appellant within 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. (Docket sheet corrected - appellant is represented by Steven Hill.)
08/27/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On August 11, 1998, this court entered an order placing attorney Steven Hill on inactive status due to a disability. Accordingly Hill is relieved of any further obligation with respect to this appeal. We remand this appeal to the district court for a determination of whether appellant is indigent. If the district court determines that appellant is indigent, it shall appoint counsel to represent appellant on appeal with 30 days of the date of this order. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment of appearance of counsel, the district court shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days within which to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. Fn1[All filing deadlines set forth in NRAP 3C shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court.]
11/16/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appointment of counsel. Gregory Barlow appointed as counsel for appellant.
02/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Barlow shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order or show cause why Barlow should not be sanctioned.
02/26/1999Other Other. Filed general appearance. Gregory J. Barlow files his general appearance herein as attorney of record for Gary John Peckham.
02/26/1999Other Other. Filed affidavit of compliance and due diligence.
03/05/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Mailed on: 3/3/99.
03/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellants appendix. Mailed on: 3/3/99.
03/23/1999MotionFiled Motion. For leave to file 11 page fast track response.
03/23/1999Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Response.
03/29/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed March 23, 1999, is granted. The eleven page fast track response provisionally submitted on March 23, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith.
03/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: entry of written judgment or order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court.
07/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of judgment of conviction filed in district court on June 1, 1999.
08/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days after the date of this order. The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. Fn2[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal.]
09/24/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's opening brief. (Mailed on:9/23/99.)
10/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's answering brief. (Mailed on: Express mail.)
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
02/07/2000Other Other. Case submitted on the record and briefs this day.
02/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13998
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14115
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14115