judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: TERRY McINTOSH v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION; and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (06-113)
Case Number:06-113Case Docketed On:05/22/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: TERRY McINTOSH v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION; and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: TERRY McINTOSH, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING MEDICAL COMMISSION; and WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerry McIntoshWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeWorkers' Compensation Medical CommissionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Keith Dodson
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Keith Dodson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 108
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/05/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
08/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Keith Dodson to appear on behalf of appellees.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
08/21/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bill G. Hibbler for appellant; Steven R. Czoschke, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Keith Dodson, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Dodson for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/16/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/12/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court. Justice Golden files a dissenting opinion in which Chief Justice Voigt joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/17/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/07/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
08/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/07/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/09/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal