judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EUGENE DE BOGORY v. LOU FOOTE

Case: A-197
A-197
05/26/1944
Application for Writ of Error
EUGENE DE BOGORY
LOU FOOTE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/28/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/05/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/06/1944Letter Filed
07/03/1944Response to Motion filed
06/28/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/05/1944Response to Petition
05/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/26/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lou FooteRespondent
Eugene de BogoryPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information