Case Information: 35485 | |||
Short Caption: | ROHDE (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - 994228 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/14/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-00630 | |
01/20/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/11/99, 12/13/99. Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. | 00-00925 | |
01/28/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-01472 | |
02/11/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-02214 | |
03/03/2000 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Fast Track Response with appendix attached w/letter. | ||
03/14/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-04031 | |
03/14/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 00-04032 | |
07/24/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-12744 | |
08/21/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14578 | |
08/21/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/24/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 22, 2000. | 00-14578 |