judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

GILES, ERMA FRANKLIN

Case: PD-0118-99
PD-0118-99
01/26/1999
PDR Case Type
GILES, ERMA FRANKLIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
05/28/1999FINAL DISPRefused
05/12/1999PDR DISPRefused
05/12/1999PDR DISPRefused
03/01/1999NO RESPONSE FILED
01/26/1999PDR FILED
01/26/1999PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1999STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Giles, Erma FranklinApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Janet Seymour Morrow
Court of Appeals Information:
01-95-01152-CR
AFF 9-10-98
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOSEPH M. GUARINO
9424906