Case: PD-0116-99
PD-0116-99
01/26/1999
PDR Case Type
GILES, ERMA FRANKLIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/28/1999 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/12/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/12/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/01/1999 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
01/26/1999 | PDR FILED | | |
01/26/1999 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/04/1999 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Giles, Erma Franklin | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Janet Seymour Morrow |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-95-01150-CR
AFF 9-10-98
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOSEPH M. GUARINO
9424904