Case Information: 86-AA-0182 | |||
Short Caption: | JAMES T. DRAUDE V. D.C. BOARD OF ZONING ADJUSTMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Of Zoning Adjustment (BZA) |
Lead: | 85-AA-1769 | Consolidated: | 86-AA-0182 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 01/30/1986 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 01/30/1986 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/25/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/24/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/25/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Intervenor-Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N | |||||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | James T. Draude | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DRAUDE, JAMES T. D.C. BOARD OF ZONING ADJUSTMENT | |||
01/01/1906 | MCGOVERNM FOR: THE PRESIDENT CONDOMINIUM MCKEYW FOR: THE PRESIDENT CONDOMINIUM DRAUDEJ FOR: JAMES T. DRAUDE DRISCOLLB FOR: PHYLLIS LEVINE | |||
01/30/1986 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/25/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/24/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/25/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/09/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |