Case Information: 35480 | |||
Short Caption: | BUSH (BRIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 9901355A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/24/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/12/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-00547 | |
01/28/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 00-01402 | |
02/24/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Hand delivered 02/24/00. | 00-02954 | |
02/24/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/17/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] Nos. 34796, 35480. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-04230 | |
04/12/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-05793 | |
04/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 17, 2000. | 00-05793 |