judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAWKINS, DALTON UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-0492
Short Caption:HAWKINS, DALTON UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3710-78Filed Date:04/01/1982

Opening Event Date:04/01/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/01/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/21/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/17/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAWKINS, DALTON UNITED STATES
04/01/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1982FiledRecord Completed
01/21/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/17/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/18/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition