judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SID W. RICHARDSON, ET AL., HOUSTON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY v. KEITH KELLY, RECEIVER (HERBERT MARSHALL, SUCCESSOR)

Case: A-196
A-196
05/26/1944
Application for Writ of Error
SID W. RICHARDSON, ET AL., HOUSTON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY
KEITH KELLY, RECEIVER (HERBERT MARSHALL, SUCCESSOR)
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/12/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/11/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/29/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/28/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/20/1945Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/26/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/18/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/18/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
06/15/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/17/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/16/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/15/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/02/1944Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/01/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/28/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/12/1944Response to Reply filedRespondent
06/09/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/05/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1947Returned document(s). See Remarks.
02/04/1947Letter Filed
01/29/1947Miscellaneous Motion
01/29/1947Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
01/18/1947Letter Filed
01/06/1947Order from Lower Court filed
08/29/1946Miscellaneous Motion
04/09/1946Order from Lower Court filed
04/08/1946Motion for production of documents filedFiling granted
01/12/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/11/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/29/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/28/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/20/1945Response to Brief filed
06/26/1945Supplemental Brief filed
06/18/1945Brief in Support of Petition
06/18/1945Brief in Support of Petition
06/16/1945Response to Motion filed
06/15/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/17/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
05/16/1945Motion to amend application for writ of errorFiling granted
05/16/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/16/1945Motion to amend application for writ of error
05/15/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/14/1945Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed
12/02/1944Reply to Response
12/02/1944Additional Copies received
12/01/1944Response to Brief filed
11/28/1944Brief on the Merits
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/12/1944Response to Reply filed
06/09/1944Reply to Response
06/05/1944Response to Petition
05/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/26/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Lassie Oliver, et al.Amicus Curiae
State of TexasAmicus Curiae
Keith Kelly, Receiver (Herbert Marshall, Successor)Respondent
Houston Transportation CompanyPetitioner
Compensation Insurance Carriers and Pacific Indemnity CompanyAmicus Curiae
Sid W. Richardson, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information