judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAMELA K. MOSS v. CHRIS BENTSEN MOSS

Case Heading (06-23)
Case Number:06-23Case Docketed On:02/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:PAMELA K. MOSS v. CHRIS BENTSEN MOSS
Full Title:PAMELA K. MOSS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CHRIS BENTSEN MOSS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPamela K. MossKenneth S. Cohen
AppelleeChris Bentsen MossLea Jacobs Kuvinka

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 67
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/01/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/14/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/05/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/20/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, 3 volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcripts; volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/26/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding; Justice Kite writing for the Court; Justice Golden concurring in part and dissenting in part.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/14/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/14/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal