judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERTSON, RAYMOND M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0057
Short Caption:ROBERTSON, RAYMOND M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F222-80Filed Date:12/05/1980

Opening Event Date:12/05/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/19/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/05/1984
Argued/Submitted:01/17/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Randy I. Bellows YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jennifer P. LymanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Bradley L. KellyYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBERTSON, RAYMOND M. UNITED STATES
12/05/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/19/1984FiledRecord Completed
10/05/1984FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/25/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition