judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THORNTON, ERNEST UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-0491
Short Caption:THORNTON, ERNEST UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CR38846-76Filed Date:04/01/1982

Opening Event Date:04/01/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/30/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/29/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/08/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Leroy Nesbitt NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THORNTON, ERNEST UNITED STATES
04/01/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/30/1982FiledRecord Completed
11/29/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/08/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/31/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition