judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1618
B-1618
06/23/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ERA BOMAN, ET AL.
J. A. HODGES, JOE HODGES, LAURA HOLLAND, ADDIE ELLIOTT AND CHARLIE SIMKINS, ALLISON J. GIBBS AND THE LAW FIRM OF OZAETA, GIBBS AND OZAETA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/04/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/29/1969Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/16/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/08/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/08/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/07/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
06/23/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/04/1969Response to Brief filed
10/29/1969Brief in Support of Petition
10/23/1969Response to Motion filed
10/16/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/08/1969Response to Petition
07/08/1969Response to Petition
07/07/1969Response to Petition
06/23/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/23/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Era Boman, et al.Petitioner
J. A. HodgesRespondent
Allison J. Gibbs and the Law Firm of Ozaeta, Gibbs and OzaetaRespondent
Joe Hodges, Laura Holland, Addie Elliott and Charlie SimkinsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information