Case Information: 37053 | |||
Short Caption: | PITTMAN (DELASK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32882 , 59625 , 59775 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C136449 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/27/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/27/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-20604 | |
12/13/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to Appellant Delask Pittman in regards to letter regarding documents submitted with notice of appeal. | ||
01/19/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-01247 | |
02/14/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-01335 | |
02/14/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/13/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2001. | 01-01335 |