judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALSTON, RONNIE L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-0436
Short Caption:ALSTON, RONNIE L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8402-81Filed Date:03/09/1982

Opening Event Date:03/09/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/25/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/10/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert J. Murphy YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John M. Facciola YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALSTON, RONNIE L. UNITED STATES
03/09/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/25/1983FiledRecord Completed
08/10/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/08/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/10/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition