Case Heading (S-20-0031) | |||||
Case Number: | S-20-0031 | Case Docketed On: | 01/29/2020 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | CLINT RAYMOND WEBB v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT DIVISION and JULIE ALIA WEBB | ||||
Full Title: | CLINT RAYMOND WEBB, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel. DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT DIVISION, Appellee (Petitioner), and JULIE ALIA WEBB, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Clint Raymond Webb | Pro Se |
Appellee | Department of Family Services - Child Support Enforcement Division | Bridget L. Hill Jill E. Kucera Wendy Susan Ross Misha Westby |
Appellee | Julie Alia Webb | Pro Se |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Support, Civil Procedure |
Opinion Number: | 2020 WY 111 |
Citation: | 471 P.3d 289 (Wyo. 2020) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/29/2020 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/29/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/29/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/29/2020 | Event - Phone Call with AGs office regarding contact information for Ms. Webb. *****Please see case note***** | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/29/2020 | Order Regarding Service to Appellee | Order | Other | Final | |
02/18/2020 | Appellant/Respondent's Motion to Correct or Complete the Record | Motion | Correct record | Final | |
02/18/2020 | Appellant's Motion to Correct or Complete the Record sent to Julia Webb by mail and email (letter in file but not uploaded) | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
02/18/2020 | Event - Phone Call to AGs office, lvm advising them of the filed Motion (they were not included on the COS) | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
03/02/2020 | Response/Objection - Motion | Response/Objection | Motion | Final | |
03/02/2020 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response and Objection of the State of Wyoming to the Appellant/Respondent's Motion to Correct or Complete the Record (forwarded to Julie Webb by Clerk's Office this date) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/03/2020 | Order - Denying Motion to Correct or Complete the Record | Order | Deny | Final | |
03/09/2020 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
03/09/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
04/21/2020 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
04/21/2020 | Brief of Appellee emailed to Ms. Webb | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
04/22/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record of appellee | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
04/23/2020 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
05/07/2020 | Reply Brief of Appellant | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
05/07/2020 | Reply Brief of Appellant emailed to Julie Webb | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
05/08/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/11/2020 | Order Assigning Case to Brief Only emailed to Ms. Webb | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
05/11/2020 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
05/18/2020 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
05/18/2020 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes (Volume 1: Original Papers; Volume 2: 1 Transcript; Volume 3: Confidential File) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/18/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
08/26/2020 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Justice Kautz writing for the Court. Justice Fox files a specially concurring opinion in which Chief Justice Davis joins. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
09/11/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
09/11/2020 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
09/11/2020 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
09/11/2020 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
09/16/2020 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/14/2020 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |