Case Information: 37059 | |||
Short Caption: | MIKELL (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48038 , 51763 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C164098 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/08/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/27/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/27/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-20671 | |
01/09/2001 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. fn1[All filing deadlines shall run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court.] | 01-00490 | |
01/31/2001 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of notice filed in district court on January 25, 2001, appointing Andrew Meyers as counsel for appellant. | 01-02087 | |
02/20/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Andrew S. Myers, Esq. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-03191 | |
03/21/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. | ||
04/02/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-05618 | |
04/02/2001 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. | 01-05620 | |
04/04/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on April 2, 2001. | 01-05732 | |
04/04/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-05620 | |
05/01/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, appellants have failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are requested. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellants' counsel. | 01-07254 | |
05/10/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 14, 2000 through August 17, 2000, and October 12, 2000. To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. | 01-07843 | |
06/11/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/15/00; 8/16/00; 8/17/00; 10/12/00. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. | 01-09647 | |
07/16/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. Respondent shall within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answer brief. Appellant may file a reply brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. | 01-12037 | |
07/31/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/30/01. | 01-12901 | |
07/31/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 01-12902 | |
09/06/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. | 01-15031 | |
10/01/2001 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Andrew Myers stating that no reply brief will be filed in this case. | 01-16518 | |
11/08/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Submitted date: November 8, 2001. | 01-18701 | |
11/08/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/01/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB | 02-16896 | |
10/29/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-16955 | |
10/29/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/20/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 31, 2002. | 02-16955 |