judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1616
B-1616
06/19/1969
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS, ELIZABETH GREESON KRUEGER, ET AL.
TEXAS PIG STANDS, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/23/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/16/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/04/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/28/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/23/1969Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
07/11/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/07/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
06/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/16/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/04/1969Response to Petition
07/28/1969Response to Petition
07/23/1969Supplement to Petition filed
07/11/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/07/1969Response to Petition
06/19/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/19/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Elizabeth Greeson Krueger, et al.Petitioner
Texas Pig Stands, Inc., et al.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information