judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STENNER (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35483
Short Caption:STENNER (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36593
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P0040Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-00603
01/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Second Notice of Appeal. 00-01311
01/28/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Amended Case Appeal Statement filed in district court on January 25, 2000. 00-01426
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should no be sanctioned. 00-05473
04/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-06197
04/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-06198
05/09/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-07621
06/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09836
07/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11673
07/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2000. 00-11673
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 12, 2000, this court filed an order dismissing this appeal. Thereafter, we received a proper person "Motion for Rehearing." Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled the proper person "Motion for Rehearing" received on June 28, 2000. 00-16612
09/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Stenner: returned unfiled, original proper person Motion for Rehearing received June 28, 2000.