judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1594
B-1594
06/09/1969
Application for Writ of Error
ROSS EDWARD HARRINGTON, ET AL.
YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF HOUSTON AND HARRIS COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/26/1970Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/31/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
06/25/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
06/09/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/03/1970Response to Motion filed
03/26/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/18/1970Order from Lower Court filed
03/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
03/11/1970Opinion issued
12/31/1969Post submission brief filed
11/05/1969Document received (See Remarks)
06/25/1969Response to Petition
06/09/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/09/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ross Edward Harrington, et al.Petitioner
Young Mens Christian Association of Houston and Harris CountyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information