Case Heading (S-18-0112) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0112 | Case Docketed On: | 05/04/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | DEVON MATTHEW BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | DEVON MATTHEW BROWN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Devon Matthew Brown | Diane M. Lozano Kirk Allan Morgan Desiree Wilson |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper Darrell Duane Jackson Catherine M. Mercer Lucas Plumb |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 42 |
Citation: | 439 P.3d 726 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
05/04/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
05/04/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
05/04/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/18/2018 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
06/19/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/20/2018 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
06/25/2018 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/26/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/09/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/09/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client | Notice-Incoming | Consent of Client | Final | |
08/13/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; Consent and Approval; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/27/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/05/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume 1, Original Papers; Volume 2, Confidential Folder; Volume 3, Transcripts; Volume 4, Exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/06/2018 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
09/10/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Lucas Plumb (Student Intern) obo Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/11/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Desiree Wilson obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/16/2018 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Desiree Wilson o/b/b Appellant; Caitlin F. Harper and Lucas Plumb, student intern, argument by Mr. Plumb o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/18/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversed and remanded with Chief Justice Davis writing for the Court. Justice Boomgaarden files a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Kautz joins. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/06/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
05/06/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
05/06/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
05/06/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
05/13/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by Sarah Kramer (5-9-19) | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |